HI SB1302 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for disaster relief, recovery, mitigation, and remediation activities for the county of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Natural Disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:45PM in conference room CR 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB1180 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Act 009, 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
HB1180 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Act 009, 04/16/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1302&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1302_.HTM |