HI SB1396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism the China-Hawaii Economic Council to further economic relations between China and Hawaii. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB538 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1338 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1396 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HB1338 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1396 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1396&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1396_.HTM |