HI SB1416 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (S) Vetoed on 05-05-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - (S) Vetoed on 05-05-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which an owner of a new car is exempted from obtaining a certificate of inspection from two years to three years from the date of purchase. Effective January 1, 2013. (SB1416 HD1)
Title
Highway Safety; Certificates of Inspection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | (S) Vetoed on 05-05-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 642). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) One Day Notice 04-18-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hashem, Pine, Rhoads voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-05-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2). | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-16-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |