HI SB1528 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes shipboard gaming on vessels in state waters. Establishes the Hawaii gaming board within DBEDT, an admission tax and a wagering tax, and a gaming fund for the deposit of fees, taxes, and fines.
Title
Shipboard Gaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to JDL/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1528 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1528_.HTM |