HI SB2001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of the clergy to report child abuse and neglect to the Department of Human Services or to the police. Specifies that the general rule of privilege under the Hawaii Rules of Evidence for confidential communications made to a member of the clergy does not apply to communications relating to child abuse or neglect. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1692 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.