HI SB2013 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the assessment of fees upon inmates for medical, dental, or mental health services or treatment that is provided within a public correctional institution in the State.
Title
Relating To Health Care Fees Of Detainees And Committed Persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Committed Persons
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Detainees
Fees Prohibited
Inmates
Medical, Dental, or Mental Health Services or Treatment
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Detainees
Fees Prohibited
Inmates
Medical, Dental, or Mental Health Services or Treatment
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2013&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2013_.HTM |