HI SB2019 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - (H) Act 137, on 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - (H) Act 137, on 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the twenty-year limit for thrill craft and parasailing permits; changes the five-year permit to a one-year permit. (CD1)
Title
Thrill Craft and Parasailing; Time Limit on Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | (H) Act 137, on 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 354). | |
2010-05-24 | (S) Act 137, 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 595). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Berg, Hanohano, Marumoto, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61-10). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Sagum; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 3:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Har Co-Chairs; Sagum, Thielen. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Wooley. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Thielen. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-12-10 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until Friday, 03-12-10. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-08-10 10:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from EDT/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2362) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Takamine. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDT/WTL. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |