HI SB2026 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of Cruelty to Animals by Slaughtering or Trafficking Dogs or Cats for Human Consumption. Includes dogs and cats bred for human consumption in the definition of "pet animal". (SB2026 HD2)
Title
Penal Code; Animal Cruelty; Slaughter or Trafficking of Dogs or Cats for Human Consumption
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Gabbard, Galuteria, Slom Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 524). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1667-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima. |
2014-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-04-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (5). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1081-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cachola, Tsuji; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-13-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 18 |
2014-02-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 8) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-05-14. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2368 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Har, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3).