HI SB2046 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 157, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 157, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits manufacture, importation, sale, transfer, and possession of bump fire stocks, multiburst trigger activators, and trigger cranks. (SB2046 HD1)
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 157, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 157, on 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 837). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-25-18. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-25-18. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Takayama, Thielen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1884-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 73) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |