HI SB2077 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Interim Construction Subaccount within the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund to be used for the interim financing of new construction projects under section 201H-43, HRS, prioritizing projects located on state- or county-owned lands; provided that, for units in for-sale projects, the units shall be made available only to qualified residents. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2310) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 1:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |