HI SB212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - (S) Recommitted to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - (S) Recommitted to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "permanent resident" for legislative reapportionment as any individual counted as a usual resident of the State in the last preceding U.S. census and requires reapportionment to be done using data on the total number of permanent residents in the State. Effective 07/01/50. (SD1)
Title
Reapportionment Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | (S) Recommitted to JDL. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-12 9:35AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |