HI SB2120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - (H) Act 034, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 246).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - (H) Act 034, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 246).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to determine alternative routes to certification for school principals and vice-principals. Repeals the department of education's authority to waive, on a case-by-case basis, certain teacher certification and school-level experience requirements for vice-principal candidates. (SD1)
Title
School Principals and Vice-Principals; Alternative Routes to Certification
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | (H) Act 034, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 246). | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Act 034, 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 492). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 450). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Keith-Agaran, Wooley. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from EDN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 834-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Awana, Hanohano, M. Lee, Souki. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Nakashima, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Takai, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Manahan, Rhoads. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Wednesday, 03-10-10 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 64) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-10 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |