HI SB2120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Re-referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Re-referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 18
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retail pet stores to maintain records regarding the source and medical history of animals sold and provide records to pet purchasers, subject to the discretion of the retail pet store. Establishes penalties. Authorizes retail pet stores to showcase pet animals owned by a nonprofit animal welfare organization. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Pet Sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3004) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2624) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 9:10AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to CPN/AEN, JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1682 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to CPN/AEN, JDC.