HI SB2126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the Pesticide Use Revolving Fund balance threshold from $250,000 to $1,000,000. (SB2126 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Pesticide Use Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3). |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Say. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/AGR on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2573) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2051) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |