HI SB2135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program to include any individual or household whose monthly income is equal to or less than three hundred per cent of the federal poverty level. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1661 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2135&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2135_.HTM |