HI SB2197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WLH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WLH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds lands with soil classified as productivity rating class B or class C to the agricultural lands exempt from subdivision requirements for purposes of leases or easements for renewable energy facilities. Adds provision that requires ongoing activity on agricultural land, unless a non-utility generator application for a project was submitted to an electric utility, or a proposed project was submitted to the Public Utilities Commission. (SD1)
Title
Solar Energy Facilities; Agricultural Land Use Districts
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WLH. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from ENE/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WLH. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/AGL deferred the measure until 02-16-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to ENE/AGL, WLH. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |