HI SB2214 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1395).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1395).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions that negotiations relating to contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund shall be to agree upon amounts that the State and counties shall contribute toward the payment of costs for a health benefits plan and group life insurance benefits for active public employees; clarifies that a decision of an arbitration panel shall be final. (CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Employer-Union Health Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1395). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1395). | |
2012-06-25 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-12 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-06-25 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1253) | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Oshiro, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Johanson. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 418). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Giugni, Kawakami. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-30-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fontaine voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4). | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Souki, Takumi. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-13-12 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 102) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-12 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-07-12 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-02-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 01-30-12 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 01-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-12 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |