HI SB2229 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 042, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 042, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows pharmacists, per a physician's prescription, to administer the influenza vaccine to persons aged fourteen to seventeen provided that the pharmacist has fulfilled certain requirements, including the training requirement to administer the influenza vaccine to minors. (SB2229 HD1)
Title
Vaccinations; Pharmacists; Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | (S) Act 042, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Act 042, on 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 480). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Deferred until 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 357). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:35PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Ching. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-20-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2564) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-10-12 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1966 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to HTH, CPN.