HI SB225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition of "residency" to rules for determining residency. Specifies that a person is not a resident of the state if the person declares residency in other states. (SB225 HD1)
Title
Elections; Residency
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Wooley. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-20-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 96) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |