HI SB2275 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the laws regarding notaries public to conform to the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts (2018), the Hawaii Uniform Electronic Transactions Act, other state notary laws, and current notary practices. Effective 1/1/2021. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Notarial Acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 395). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-06-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 06-30-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 06-30-20 2:00PM. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-12-20 at 2:30 PM. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 182) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3257) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2839) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TEC, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |