HI SB2288 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that travel reports submitted by state employees, officers, or other representatives of state departments or agencies, in connection with out-of-state or intra-state travel for purposes of official state business, be made available for public review on the Comptroller's website, subject to certain exceptions. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Government.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-14-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 97) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2715) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Comptroller
Department of Accounting and General Services
Expenditure Ceiling
Public Access
Travel Reports
Comptroller
Department of Accounting and General Services
Expenditure Ceiling
Public Access
Travel Reports