HI SB2317 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 203, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Act 203, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to submit annual reports to the Legislature relating to child and maternal deaths and death reviews in the State. Requires, upon written request from the Director of Health, all providers of health care or social services and county and state agencies to disclose child death review information, under certain conditions. Allows the Department of Health to conduct multidisciplinary and multiagency reviews of maternal deaths. Requires, upon written request from the Director of Health, all providers of health care or social services and county and state agencies to, under certain conditions, provide information or other materials relating to the condition and treatment of any person to the Department of Health, or its designee, for studies to reduce maternal morbidity or mortality. Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to conduct child death reviews and implement a program to perform maternal death reviews. (CD1)
Title
Department of Health; Child and Maternal Death Reviews; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Act 203, 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2016-07-07 | House | Act 203, on 07/05/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15-16). |
2016-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Johanson, Creagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Johanson Co-Chairs; Creagan, Tupola. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 397). |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-14-16 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-16 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-16 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1898 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2