HI SB2387 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act 003, 04/11/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Act 003, 04/11/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects erroneous references in chapters 520 and 520A, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Owners Of Land.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Act 003, 04/11/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2024-04-11 | House | Act 003, on 04/11/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 458). |
2024-03-22 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 24). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-29-24. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2739) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1920 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1