HI SB2424 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the construction and use of micro housing units on Hawaiian home lands approved by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, and leased to native Hawaiian beneficiaries who meet the minimum Hawaiian blood quantum requirement, notwithstanding county zoning laws. Authorizes the use of the Hawaiian Home Loan Fund and Hawaiian Home General Loan Fund for assistance in purchasing or renting micro housing units for use on approved Hawaiian home lands and leased to beneficiaries who meet the minimum Hawaiian blood quantum requirement. Makes appropriations to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands for construction of micro housing units, subject to certain conditions, and to build general organizational capacity of native Hawaiian-controlled nonprofit housing developers. (SB2424 HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing For Native Hawaiians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Espero, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Gates, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Say, McDermott. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 575). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1987-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from HSG/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Gates. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/OMH on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-15-18 9:53AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/OMH on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:53AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2908) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2472) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2473 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).