HI SB2482 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary office of wellness and resilience within the office of the governor. Authorizes the office of wellness and resilience to address issues and implement solutions to improve wellness and resilience, including issues and solutions identified by the trauma-informed care task force. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Wellness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kitagawa, Tam, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Kitagawa, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Misalucha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1791-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 3:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3059) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2488) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1970 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3