HI SB2511 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to consider the short-term and long-term retention and creation of local jobs in its review of electric utility performance. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 134) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2755) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |