HI SB2514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 041, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 041, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person is engaging in business in the State for the purpose of the general excise tax law if, in the current or immediately preceding calendar year, the person has $100,000 or more in gross income, or two hundred or more separate transactions, from the sale of tangible personal property delivered in the State, services used or consumed in the State, or intangible property used in the State. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Act 041, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141). |
2018-06-13 | House | Act 041, on 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 579). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Ito, Matsumoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt excused (2). |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2653) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-15-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |