HI SB2534 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 309, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1426).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 309, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1426).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the School Facilities Special Fund to accept revenue generated from the non-permanent disposition of public school lands and facilities to fund school facility construction and upgrade to meet twenty-first century school standards. Includes a reporting requirement. Effective July 1, 2012. (SB2534 HD2)
Title
Public School Facilities; Public Land Development Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 309, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1426). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 309, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1426). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) One Day Notice 04-24-12. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-24-12. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers have scheduled a decision making to agree to the House amendments on 04-20-12 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Dela Cruz, Ige, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Takumi, Har Co-Chairs; Ito, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 457). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Ching, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, C. Lee, McKelvey, Nakashima, Wooley voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1628-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Ching, C. Lee, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Wooley voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Chang, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Takai; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Saiki; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Wooley. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-12. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-19-12 2:15PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-12-12 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 216) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-12 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDU/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2200) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee on WLH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Re-Referred to EDU/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to WLH/EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |