HI SB2561 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits intentionally leaving or confining pet animals in a vehicle under conditions that endanger their health, safety, or well-being. Permits law enforcement officers, animal control officers, and firefighters to enter an unattended vehicle to protect the health, safety, or well-being of a pet animal that is endangered by being left or confined in an unattended vehicle. Allows private citizens to rescue a pet animal that has been left in an unattended vehicle under certain circumstances. Takes effect 4/14/2112. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Animal Endangerment.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2975) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2528) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1671 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1