HI SB26 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB26
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a landlord from recovering possession of a dwelling unit from a tenant if the habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Caps a tenant's liability for rent if the habitability of the premises is significantly impaired. Provides remedies for retaliatory evictions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 62) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB524 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB26 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 17
SB26 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 17