HI SB2619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a subsidy to the Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County for the career criminal prosecution unit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney For Hawaii County.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 297) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3307) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 10:01AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy
Career Criminal Prosecution Unit
Office of the Prosecuting Attorney for Hawaii County
Subsidy