HI SB2627 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any new contract entered into by the Office of Elections for equipment or services relating to preparing ballots or counting votes include the capability to randomize the names of candidates appearing on the ballot if technologically possible. Requires candidate names to be randomized on ballots to the greatest extent possible. Requires the Office of Elections to inform voters and candidates, by a method suited for the voting system, that the names of candidates may not be in alphabetical order.
Title
Relating To Arrangement Of Candidate Names On Ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Elefante, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 9:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1606 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.