HI SB266 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to further develop the language access resource center and multilingual website pilot project. Authorizes the hire of necessary personnel to staff the resource center and administer the multilingual website.
Title
Office of Language Access; Language Access Resource Center; Multilingual Website Pilot Project; Interpretation and Translation Service; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB846 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=266&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB266_.HTM |