HI SB2702 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the practice of election fraud intimidation includes carrying any firearm or weapon and photographing the face of any voter without permission from both the voter and an appropriate election official when those actions occur at or near a voter service center, place of deposit, or polling place.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-27-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2702&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2702_.HTM |