HI SB2721 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the penalties for violations of ocean recreation laws. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36-24). |
2024-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tarnas, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Rhoads, Elefante, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 10:30AM; CR 229. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Poepoe, Souza. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante, Fevella. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia, Souza voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-03-24. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan. |
2024-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-14-24 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, McKelvey). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2963) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2658) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-14-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3