HI SB2737 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 202, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 202, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits use of interactive conference technology to increase ability of members of state and county boards and commissions to attend board meetings; allows a board member with a disability that limits or impairs the member's ability to physically attend the meeting to participate in a board meeting from a location not accessible to the public if connected by both visual and audio means. (CD1)
Title
Sunshine Law; Board Meetings; Notice of Board Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | (S) Act 202, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). | |
2012-07-06 | (H) Act 202, on 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 96-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 96-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokioka, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 3:31PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 3:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 3:01PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-12 2:45PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 2:45PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Thielen. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 474). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Herkes, Souki. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-15-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 272) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2464) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2114) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDT, JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2475 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).