HI SB2816 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 273, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 273, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the department of health the option of recognizing full accreditation by the Joint Commission on Accreditation of Healthcare Organizations as evidence of hospital compliance with all licensing inspection for the duration of the accreditation. (CD1)
Title
Hospital Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 273, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 273, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1376). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92-12). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, M. Lee; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Espero, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Morikawa Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Ward. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 506). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 55 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 324) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2493) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2554 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7