HI SB2858 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - (S) Act 176, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - (S) Act 176, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a process for an agency to obtain judicial review of a decision made by the Office of Information Practices relating to the Sunshine Law or the Uniform Information Practices Act, and clarifies standard of review. Effective 01/01/13. (CD1)
Title
Sunshine Law; Uniform Information Practices Act; Appeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | (S) Act 176, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). | |
2012-06-29 | (H) Act 176, on 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 18 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ige, Kim, Nishihara, Tokuda, Wakai . 7 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Gabbard, Ihara, Kidani, Ryan, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105-12). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Har, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 2:35PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Har Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Fontaine, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-30-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pine, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-16-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 342) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-07-12 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2596 (Same As) 2012-02-13 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.