HI SB2866 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
By July 1, 2025, requires governmental bodies of the executive branch of the State to develop an online project management platform. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-19-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 218) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2958) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2167 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 2