HI SB2868 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 211, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 211, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes registration requirements and the transient accommodations tax on transient accommodations brokers, travel agencies, and tour packagers that enter into arrangements to furnish transient accommodations at noncommissioned negotiated contract rates on their share of the proceeds. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/18. (SB2868 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 211, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 211, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 848). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-06-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 4:35PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 11:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 662). |
2018-04-23 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Hashimoto added as Conferee. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Keith-Agaran, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Fukumoto, Ward. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1875-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, LoPresti. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:15AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 3). |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-18. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report filed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2852) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2187 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 8