HI SB2881 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the role of the Board of Public Accountancy in selecting members to serve on the Board's Peer Review Oversight Committee.
Title
Relating To The Peer Review Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1206-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Mizuno. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 06-24-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2948) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2325 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).