HI SB2885 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Act 020, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Act 020, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of birth defects data for education of health care providers to reduce morbidity or mortality and to increase physicians' knowledge of resources available for families of persons with birth defects. (SD1)
Title
Birth Defects Program; Use of Data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Act 020, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Act 020, 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384). |
2016-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, Oshiro, Rhoads, Thielen, Ward excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Rhoads, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2356 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to CPH.