HI SB2893 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a nine-member gambling commission exempt from section 26-34, Hawaii Revised Statutes, attached to the office of the auditor, to undertake a comprehensive analysis of the social and economic costs and benefits of different forms of gambling and their impacts on the State in order for legislators to make informed policy decisions regarding gambling. Requires report to governor and legislature twenty days prior to the 2013 and 2014 legislative sessions. Commission sunsets 12/31/2013. Appropriates funds to undertake the analysis, including contracts for services. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Gambling; Commission; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Recived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 355) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom, Taniguchi, Tokuda). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from EDT/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Tokuda. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/WAM. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-12 3:00PM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-12 10:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2828 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9