HI SB29 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB29
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pesticide buffer zones for sensitive areas beginning on July 1, 2018. Establishes penalties for violations. Requires the Department of Agriculture, based on input from the Advisory Committee on Pesticides, to adopt rules that determine amounts, distances, and wind speeds relating to pesticide buffer zones, within 18 months of the effective date. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDL. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/JDL. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB29 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDL.