HI SB2903 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public entry into wildfire-affected areas for the purpose of habitation until the Department of Health provides notice that the wildfire-affected area is safe to enter for this purpose.
Title
Relating To Wildfire-affected Areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2204) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HHS, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |