HI SB3091 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to the Department of Education for its food service operations. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. (CD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Education For Food Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 185-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 185-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Received from Governor re: Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 10). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Morikawa, La Chica, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 2:09PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Richards. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Morikawa Co-Chairs; La Chica, Garcia. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1797-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward. |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-29-24. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2736) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto, Lee. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-24 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU, WAM.