HI SB351 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various provisions related to the Aha Moku Advisory Committee, including budgetary requirements. Appropriates funds for expenses of the Aha Moku Advisory Committee and the annual Puwalu event. (SB351 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Aha Moku Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1370-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Gates. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 62) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2788) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB351 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.