HI SB372 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Act 055, 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Act 055, 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a law enforcement officer has a duty to intervene if the law enforcement officer reasonably believes that another law enforcement officer is using unnecessary or excessive force on an arrestee. Requires the law enforcement officer to report the incident to the other law enforcement officer's supervisor. Requires relevant departments to submit annual reports to the Legislature. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Government Services Relating To The Law.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | Act 055, 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). |
2023-06-05 | House | Act 055, on 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 928). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Shimabukuro. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-23. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-23. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Deferred one day 04-03-23. |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 146) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |