HI SB384 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the address confidentiality program to help victims of domestic violence and sexual assault relocate and keep their addresses confidential. Creates the Address Confidentiality Program Surcharge Fund. Requires the Crime Victim Compensation Commission to report back to the Legislature. (SB384 HD1)
Title
Address Confidentiality Program; Address Confidentiality Program Surcharge Fund; Crime Victim Compensation Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-19-15 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-15 at 11:30 AM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-17-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 123) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB446 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).