HI SB435 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Instructs the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission to assess the effects of tourism on climate change and publish a report on its findings. Appropriates moneys. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Greenhouse Gas Emissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB435 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.